Quantitative Aptitude: Simplification Questions Set 62

Directions: What value will come in place of question mark (?) in the following questions?

  1. 7/8 of 256 + 1(1/6) of 786 = ?
    1100
    2555
    1000
    1141
    1150
    Option D
    7/8 of 256 + 1(1/6) of 786 = ?
    => 224 + 917 = ?
    =>1141

     

  2. 54(8/9) + 3(61/62) + 16(46/93) = ?
    70
    75.36
    62.3
    54.25
    66.67
    Option B
    54(8/9) + 3(61/62) + 16(46/93) = ?
    => 54.89 + 3.98 + 16.49
    => 75.36(approx.)

     

  3. 83.2 * (64)4.4 * (56)2.5 * (343)4 =56?
    10.5
    16.3
    14.5
    11.11
    13.4
    Option C
    83.2 * (64)4.4 * (56)2.5 * (343)4=56?
    =>83.2 * 8(2*4.4) * (8*7)2.5 * (73)4= 56?
    => 8(3.2 + 8.8 + 2.5) * 7(2.5 + 12) = 56?
    => 5614.5 = 56?
    => ? = 14.5

     

  4. (9999 / 11) – (555 / 3) + (4096/8) = ?
    1110
    2223
    1554
    990
    1236
    Option E
    (9999 / 11) – (555 / 3) + (4096/8) = ?
    => 909 – 185 + 512 = ?
    =>? = 1236

     

  5. ¼ of 4096 – 17% of ? = 95
    5464.70
    5225.64
    4882.15
    3456.23
    4220.3
    Option A
    ¼ of 4096 – 17% of ? = 95
    => 1024 – 17% of ? = 95
    => (929 *100)/ 17 = ?
    => ? = 5464.70

     

  6. [(16.5 * 4)/ 3 + 1444 / 3.8 ] = ? / 18
    9560
    5885
    7236
    8550
    6445
    Option C
    [(16.5 * 4)/ 3 + 1444 / 3.8 ] = ? /18
    =>22 + 380 = ? /18
    => 402*18 =?
    => ? =7236

     

  7. ? – 102 * 19 + 2660/5 = 1705/5
    1709
    2200
    1550
    1987
    1100
    Option A
    ? – 102* 19 + 2660/5 = 1705/5
    =>? – 1368 = 341
    => ? =341+1368 = 1709

     

  8. (36)2 / 2161/3 – 198/4 = ?
    172.3
    125.4
    150
    120.15
    166.5
    Option E
    (36)2 / (216)1/3 – 198/4 = ?
    => 1296/6- 49.5 =? => 216 – 49.5 =166.5

     

  9. (3738/42) * 41.23 +3442.56 – ? = 3672/18
    5523.5
    6908.3
    4550.2
    2556.6
    7854.5
    Option B
    (3738/42) * 41.23 +3442.56 – ? = 3672/18
    =>89 *41.23 + 3442.56 – ? = 204
    =>3669.47 + 3442.56 – ? = 204
    => 7112.03 -204 = ?
    =>? = 6908.03

     

  10. ? – [142 * 14 + 166]/8 = 1905/5
    17.25
    23
    11
    15.1
    13.5
    Option A
    ? – [142 * 14 + 166]/8 = 1905/5
    =>? – 363.75 = 381
    => ? =381-363.75 = 17.25

     


Related posts

Leave a Comment