Quantitative Aptitude: Simplification Questions Set 71

Directions(1-10): What will come in place of question mark “?” in the following questions.

  1. 248.004 × 5.06 + 30.12% of 739.86 + ? = 1770.93
    289
    309
    256
    300
    330
    Option B
    248.004 × 5.06 + 30.12% of 739.86 + ? = 1770.93
    ? ≃ 1771 − 248×5 – 30/100 ×740
    ≃ 309

     

  2. 41.05 × 9.96 – 32.99 × 9.11 = (44 + ?) × 2
    10
    22
    17
    13
    20
    Option D
    41.05 × 9.96 – 32.99 × 9.11 = (44 + ?) × 2
    41 × 10 – 33 × 9 = (44 + ?) × 2
    ⇒ ? ≃ 56.5 – 44
    ⇒ ? ≃ 13

     

  3. 224% of 875 + 78.005 × 15.005 = ?
    3202
    3000
    2320
    3130
    3250
    Option D
    224% of 875 + 78.005 × 15.005 = ?
    ? ≃ 224/100 ×875 + 78×15 ≃ 3,130

     

  4. 141 ÷ 34 + 223 × 30.02 = ?
    6000
    6260
    6250
    6700
    6160
    Option D
    141 ÷ 34 + 223 × 30.02 = ?
    ? ≃ 140/35 + 223×30 ≃ 6,700

     

  5. 35.02% of 3250 + 34.97 × 350 = ?
    13250
    13450
    13380
    13388
    13425
    Option D
    35.02% of 3250 + 34.97 × 350 = ?
    ? ≃ 35/100 ×3250 + 35×350 ≃ 13,388

     

  6. (9321 + 5406 + 1001) ÷ (498 + 929 + 660) = ?
    8.3
    7.5
    6.6
    7.7
    8.9
    Option B
    (9321 + 5406 + 1001) ÷ (498 + 929 + 660) = ?
    (9321 + 5406 + 1001) ÷ (498 + 929 + 660)
    = 15728 ÷ 2087 ≈ 7.5

     

  7. 459% of 849.947 + 266.5% of 6284.012 – 1486.002 = ?
    15560
    17890
    18950
    19140
    19780
    Option D
    459% of 849.947 + 266.5% of 6284.012 – 1486.002 = ?
    460×850/100 + 2.665 × 6284 − 1486
    = 3910 − 1486 + 2.66 × 6284 ≈ 19140

     

  8. 5237.897 – 6629.010 + 7153.999 – 2205.102 = ?
    3568
    3520
    3550
    3452
    3557
    Option E
    5237.897 – 6629.010 + 7153.999 – 2205.102 = ?
    5238 − 6630 + 7154 − 2205 = 12392 − 8835
    = 3557

     

  9. 1679 ÷ 14.95 × 5.02 = ?
    629
    459
    678
    662
    560
    Option E
    1679 ÷ 14.95 × 5.02 = ?
    1680 ÷ 15 × 5 = 112 × 5 = 560

     

  10. 447.75 ÷ 28 × 4.99 = ?
    67
    85
    99
    80
    76
    Option D
    447.75 ÷ 28 × 4.99 = ?
    448 ÷ 28 × 5 = 16 × 5 = 80

     


Related posts